TN HJR0114 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Tosha Edens, top ten graduate, Cherokee High School
Title
Tosha Edens, top ten graduate, Cherokee High School
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-03-17 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-03-17 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-03-17 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-03-17 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-03-17 | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-15 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/17/2011 | |
2011-03-14 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-03-10 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-03-10 | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-07 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/10/11 | |
2011-03-07 | Filed for intro. |