TN HJR0103 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Tennesseans to register as organ and tissue donors.
Title
A RESOLUTION to urge Tennesseans to register as organ and tissue donors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-05 | House | Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |