TN HJR0059 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Continues special joint committee established by HJR 909 of 105th General Assembly to study Tennessee's transportation funding system.
Title
Continues special joint committee established by HJR 909 of 105th General Assembly to study Tennessee's transportation funding system.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Senate - S. TRANS CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Senate - S. TRANS CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-19 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-19 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-06-16 | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-12 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-12 | S. Reset on Cal. for 6/16/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/12/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-08 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Rec for concur by S. F,W&M Comm., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S. Trans Consent cal. for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-16 | Recd from H., ref. to S. Trans. Comm. | |
2009-03-12 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-03-12 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2009-03-12 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0001) | |
2009-03-10 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/10/2009 | |
2009-03-03 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 03/03/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance | |
2009-02-24 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 02/25/2009 | |
2009-02-23 | Re-ref. to Budget of FW&M | |
2009-02-17 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 02/17/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., ref. to Transportation | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |