TN HJR0056 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Representative G.A. Hardaway
Title
A RESOLUTION to commend Representative G.A. Hardaway for his honorable and astute service as chairman of the Tennessee Black Caucus of State Legislators during the 111th General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-03-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/25/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-02-11 | House | Adopted, Ayes 82, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar |
2021-02-10 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/10/2021 |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |