TN HJR0055 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges local education agencies to raise awareness of importance of positive male role models in schools.
Title
Urges local education agencies to raise awareness of importance of positive male role models in schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-08 | House | Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., ref. to Education |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |