TN HJR0042 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Jeremiah Murray, Eagle Scout

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize Jeremiah Murray on becoming an Eagle Scout.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02 Signed by Governor.
2021-03-01HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-03-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-02-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-02-26HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-02-25SenateConcurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-02-23SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/25/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-02-09HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-02-08HouseAdopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-01-15HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/8/2021
2021-01-15HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback