TN HJR0013 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Metropolitan Nashville Police Officers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor those venerable members of the Metropolitan Nashville Police Department for their selfless acts of heroism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22 Signed by Governor.
2021-01-21HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-01-20SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-01-20HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-01-20HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-01-15SenateConcurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2021-01-14SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/15/2021
2021-01-14SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-01-13HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-01-13HouseAdopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-01-12HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. 1/13/2021
2021-01-11HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback