TN HJR0005 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Makes application to Congress for the purpose of calling an Article V convention to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution to set a limit on the number of terms to which a person may be elected as a member of the Congress of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to make application to the Congress of the United States pursuant to Article V of the United States Constitution to call a convention for proposing amendments to set a limit on the number of terms to which a person may be elected as a Member of the United States House of Representatives and to set a limit on the number of terms to which a person may be elected as a Member of the United States Senate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-03-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-23HouseAdopted, Ayes 66, Nays 27, PNV 3
2023-03-16HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2023
2023-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2023
2023-03-15HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-03-08HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2023
2023-03-07HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2023-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/7/2023
2023-02-14HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-01-25HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
2023-01-11HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-01-10HouseIntro., ref. to State Government Committee
2022-12-16HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback