TN HB9003 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits public employers from mandating COVID-19 vaccines as a condition of employment; requires private employers to document certain information regarding COVID-19 vaccine mandates for employees; imputes strict liability against private employers who mandate COVID-19 vaccines for employees if an employee has a severe adverse reaction or develops a severe health condition as the result of being vaccinated. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 29; Title 50 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 29; Title 50 and Title 68, relative to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9002 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee