TN HB7065 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee of 1st Extraordinary Session
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee of 1st Extraordinary Session
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the bureau of TennCare to submit to the federal centers for medicare and medicaid services an application for a research and demonstration waiver under Section 1115 of the federal Social Security Act to provide housing solutions for Tennesseans in need of mental health services; includes the provision of certain services as minimum requirements for the terms of the waiver application. - Amends TCA Title 33 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33 and Title 71, relative to services for persons with mental health needs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee of 1st Extraordinary Session |
2023-08-22 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee |
2023-08-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-08-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 8/22/2023 |
2023-08-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2023-08-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-08-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB7022 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-23 - Lay on the Table