TN HB7060 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires juvenile offenders alleged to have committed certain offenses and meeting certain other criteria to be transferred to adult criminal court for disposition as if the juvenile were an adult; authorizes an appeal for such transfers. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 40 and Chapter 264 of the Public Acts of 2023.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 40 and Chapter 264 of the Public Acts of 2023, relative to juvenile offenders.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-22 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-08-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 8/22/2023 |
2023-08-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-08-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-08-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-08-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB7084 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table