TN HB7021 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - P2C, ref. to Education 12 of Extraordinary Session
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires LEAs serving any of the grades K-8 to provide in-person instruction for students for a minimum of 70 days in the 2020-2021 school year by June 30, 2021, and the full 180 days in the 2021-2022 school year; the commissioner of education may withhold all or part of an LEAs BEP funding, if the LEA fails to comply with the in-person instruction requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to in-person student attendance to remediate learning loss sustained as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21HouseP2C, ref. to Education 12 of Extraordinary Session
2021-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-19HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7024 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback