TN HB7013 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on August 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes from 30 days to 72 hours the time frame within which a clerk of the circuit or general sessions court must notify the TBI of the final disposition of criminal proceedings against a person after final disposition of such proceedings; requires the clerk to notify the TBI of the final disposition of such proceedings by electronic submission; requires the clerk of the municipal court, when exercising concurrent general sessions court jurisdiction, to notify the TBI by electronic submission of the final disposition of such proceedings against a person no later than 72 hours after final disposition of such proceedings. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 18 and Title 18, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16, Chapter 18 and Title 18, Chapter 4, relative to notification to the Tennessee bureau of investigation of final disposition of criminal proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-08-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-08-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-08-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 8/24/23 |
2023-08-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session for 8/24/2023 |
2023-08-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session |
2023-08-22 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 8/23/2023 |
2023-08-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-08-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 8/22/2023 |
2023-08-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-08-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-08-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-08-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-08-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB7086 (Crossfiled) 2023-09-08 - Signed by Governor.