TN HB3981 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pr. Ch. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pr. Ch. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, authorizes Hancock County to operate a home health agency in Grainger, Claiborne, and Hawkins counties.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, authorizes Hancock County to operate a home health agency in Grainger, Claiborne, and Hawkins counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pr. Ch. 75 | |
2010-06-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-11 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-08 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-06-03 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-03 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-05-24 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-05-17 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-05-17 | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-14 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/17/10 | |
2010-04-01 | P2C held on desk. | |
2010-03-31 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-03-29 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3943 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 75
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3981&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3981.pdf |