TN HB3892 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Pub. Ch. 974
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Pub. Ch. 974
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes Washington County, subject to a two-thirds vote of the county legislative body, to opt out of bidding requirements of the county purchasing law for the purchase of group health insurance contracts.
Title
As enacted, authorizes Washington County, subject to a two-thirds vote of the county legislative body, to opt out of bidding requirements of the county purchasing law for the purchase of group health insurance contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Pub. Ch. 974 | |
2010-06-07 | Effective date(s) 07/01/10 | |
2010-05-26 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-05-14 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-05-12 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-05-11 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-05-06 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-06 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-04-15 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-04-14 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2010-04-14 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1258) | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/08/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2010-02-11 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-02-04 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3655 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 974