TN HB3763 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1104
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1104
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the deadline for the Niswonger Children's Hospital special license plate to meet the minimum order requirement to July 1, 2013. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, extends the deadline for the Niswonger Children's Hospital special license plate to meet the minimum order requirement to July 1, 2013. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1104 | |
2012-05-01 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-30 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-04-23 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for next calendar | |
2012-04-20 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-03-27 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Action Def. in Transportation Committee to 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-02-02 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-31 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3545 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1104