TN HB3749 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1108
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1108
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires members of the highway patrol investigating motor vehicle accidents on interstates to note on the accident report whether physical barriers are present at the site of the accident. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10.
Title
As enacted, requires members of the highway patrol investigating motor vehicle accidents on interstates to note on the accident report whether physical barriers are present at the site of the accident. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1108 | |
2012-05-01 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-30 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-30 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2012-04-25 | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee | |
2012-02-02 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-30 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3742 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1108