TN HB3377 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates Class D felony offense of statutory kidnapping, which is removing a person between 13-18 years of age from this state, where the defendant is at least four years older than the person, knows the person being removed is a minor and knows the defendant does not have the consent of the minor's parents or guardian to remove the minor. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, creates Class D felony offense of statutory kidnapping, which is removing a person between 13-18 years of age from this state, where the defendant is at least four years older than the person, knows the person being removed is a minor and knows the defendant does not have the consent of the minor's parents or guardian to remove the minor. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cobb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-16 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3461 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3377&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3377.pdf |