TN HB2951 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class C felony the offenses of unlawful purchase by or unlawful sale to a person who is prohibited by state or federal law from owning, possessing, or purchasing a firearm; prohibits the purchase or sale of ammunition by or to such a person; prohibits the transfer or sale of a firearm or ammunition to a person receiving treatment at a treatment resource for mental illness or serious emotional disturbance and not just when the person is receiving inpatient treatment. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2836 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee