TN HB2946 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides for the remittance of an unused balance of funds in a sports betting account to the bettor by a licensee after a three-year period in which the account has been inactive; establishes notice requirements for a licensee for such remittance; authorizes a licensee to remit such funds to the state treasurer as unclaimed property after a certain period during which the licensee exercises reasonable due diligence to locate the bettor. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 49, Part 1 and Title 66, Chapter 29, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 49, Part 1 and Title 66, Chapter 29, Part 1, relative to sports wagering.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2875 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee