TN HB2898 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a registry of persons convicted of the criminal offense of domestic assault; requires the bureau to maintain the registry. - Amends TCA Title 18; Section 38-6-103; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 18; Section 38-6-103; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to domestic violence.
Sponsors
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. John Gillespie [R] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Elaine Davis [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2277 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024