TN HB2897 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes proprietary information provided to the division of benefits administration for the purposes of administering group insurance plans for public officers and employees confidential. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Title
As introduced, makes proprietary information provided to the division of benefits administration for the purposes of administering group insurance plans for public officers and employees confidential. - Amends TCA Title 8.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2693 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee