TN HB2897 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires institutions of higher education within the University of Tennessee and the Tennessee Board of Regents systems to accept courses completed within 20 years for transfer, credit, graduation, or matriculation; excludes science, technology, and medical courses. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires institutions of higher education within the University of Tennessee and the Tennessee Board of Regents systems to accept courses completed within 20 years for transfer, credit, graduation, or matriculation; excludes science, technology, and medical courses. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education of ED to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education of ED to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education of ED to 3/17/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education of ED to 3/10/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education of ED to 2/24/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 02/10/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to s/c Higher Education of ED | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3062 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-28 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2897&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2897.pdf |