TN HB2860 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class C misdemeanor of restraining a dog with a chain, cord, tether, cable, or similar device while a disaster is imminent or occurring; states that a person is not subject to prosecution for a violation unless the person has previously received a warning citation for a violation. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 44, Chapter 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 44, Chapter 17, relative to criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Gloria Johnson [D] |
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2243 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-18 - Failed to pass H., Ayes 32, Nays 40, PNV 18