TN HB2845 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits a beer permittee from selling at retail refrigerated or cold beer. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 55 and Title 57.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 39; Title 55 and Title 57, relative to alcohol.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-15HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2024-02-14HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2024-02-08HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2024-02-05HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2024-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2024-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2636 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback