TN HB2822 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, renames the "Dependent Children Scholarship Act" the "Surviving Spouses and Dependent Children Scholarship Act"; extends scholarship eligibility to dependent children of members of the armed services totally disabled or killed in the line of duty and surviving spouses of law enforcement officers, firefighters, emergency medical service technicians, or members of the armed services killed in the line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, relative to financial aid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | No Action Taken |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2896 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Failed in Senate Education Committee / no second