TN HB2814 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that reports, which are required to be submitted by the authorizing judge, attorney general and reporter, and investigating law enforcement agency regarding the interception of wire, oral, or electronic communication, may be submitted electronically. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, specifies that reports, which are required to be submitted by the authorizing judge, attorney general and reporter, and investigating law enforcement agency regarding the interception of wire, oral, or electronic communication, may be submitted electronically. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2890 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee