TN HB2783 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes, from July 1, 2022, to July 1, 2025, retirees who have been retired for at least 60 days from TCRS or from a superseded system administered by the state, or from a local retirement fund, to accept re-employment as a kindergarten through twelfth grade teacher, substitute teacher, or school bus driver without loss or suspension of retirement benefits if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 8, relative to reemployment as a teacher, substitute teacher, or bus driver after retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-04-13 | Pub. Ch. 821 | |
2022-04-08 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 3 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0634) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0572) |
2022-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2702 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 821