TN HB2766 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 698
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 698
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an applicant who has satisfactorily completed a driver education and training course offered for Class D vehicles by nonpublic schools in categories 1, 2, or 3 as recognized by the state board of education, a public school, a public institution of higher learning, or a commercial driver training school and who resides 30 or more miles from a driver services center to be allowed to complete online any classroom training that is required as a prerequisite to obtaining a Class H or hardship license. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 3, relative to driver education and training for noncommercial driver licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 698 | |
2024-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2356 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024