TN HB2756 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 786
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 786
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, "Alex Allen Memorial Bridge," S.R. 272 in Marshall County.
Title
As enacted, "Alex Allen Memorial Bridge," S.R. 272 in Marshall County.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Bass [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Pub. Ch. 786 | |
2010-04-27 | Effective date(s) 04/16/10 | |
2010-04-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-04-08 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-04-07 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-04-07 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-04-06 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-04-05 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-05 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-03-24 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-03-22 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-03-22 | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/22/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/18/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-02-16 | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 02/16/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Placed on s/c cal Rural Roads of TR for 02/10/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | Assigned to s/c Rural Roads of TR | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2557 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 786
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2756&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2756.pdf |