TN HB2715 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes standards for state recognition of Native American Indian tribes. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As introduced, establishes standards for state recognition of Native American Indian tribes. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee--Govenment Operations for review | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2715&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB2715.pdf |