TN HB2714 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, names bridge in Sullivan County in honor of the late Richard Lee Edwards, Sr.
Title
As introduced, names bridge in Sullivan County in honor of the late Richard Lee Edwards, Sr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-04-16 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-04-16 | Passed H., Ayes 99, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-12 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/16/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-02-07 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/7/2012 | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2546 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-23 - P2C, ref. to S. T&S Comm.