TN HB2705 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes local governments to regulate, including the prohibition of, smoking and the use of vapor products in age-restricted venues; defines the terms “age-restricted venue” and “retail tobacco store” for the purposes of the Prevention of Youth Access to Tobacco, Smoking Hemp, and Vapor Products Act; prohibits local governments from regulating smoking and the use of vapor products in retail vapor product stores and cigar bars; exempts cigar bars that limit access to patrons 21 years of age or older from the prohibition on smoking in enclosed places. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 39, relative to the regulation of certain products by governmental entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1110 | |
2022-04-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/22 |
2022-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-18 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2219 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022