TN HB2690 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, shortens the time frame for the department of children's services to submit a report to the court with the department's recommendations following an assessment of a child who has been adjudicated delinquent, unruly, or dependent and neglected from 15 days, which may be extended up to 30 days, to 10 days, which may be extended up to 20 days. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, relative to children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-03-01 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2605 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2022