TN HB2675 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1026
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1026
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows a member of the general assembly to use campaign account funds for lodging expenses if the member is not otherwise eligible for reimbursement or the reimbursement does not cover the total amount of the expense and for mileage reimbursement above the amount reimbursed by the state. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2 and Title 3, relative to general assembly members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1026 | |
2022-04-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/22 |
2022-04-18 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/14/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-17 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Sponsor change. |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1947 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2022