TN HB2669 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, replaces the statutory terms "board member" and "member" with the term "trustee" in the provisions governing appointments to the board of trustees in the event of vacancies resulting from the death, disability, resignation, or ineligibility of a state employee who serves on the board. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, replaces the statutory terms "board member" and "member" with the term "trustee" in the provisions governing appointments to the board of trustees in the event of vacancies resulting from the death, disability, resignation, or ineligibility of a state employee who serves on the board. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2020-06-17HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-06-17HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-06-17HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0855)
2020-06-17HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0598)
2020-06-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020
2020-06-15HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-15HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-06-11HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-11HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020
2020-06-10HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-06-05HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020
2020-06-05HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-06-04HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-05-27HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 6/4/2020
2020-05-27HouseAction def. in State Committee to 6/3/2020
2020-05-20HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseAction def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020
2020-03-04HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
2020-02-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/4/2020
2020-02-26HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
2020-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/26/2020
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2020-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2020-02-06HouseP1C.
2020-02-05HouseIntro.
2020-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2898 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback