TN HB2668 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies the types of standards that the Tennessee emergency medical services board may promulgate related to the licensure of air ambulance services and special personnel equipment operation and activities; identifies such standards as including response and operations standards, standards for communications, and records and forms. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 68, Chapter 140.
Title
As introduced, specifies the types of standards that the Tennessee emergency medical services board may promulgate related to the licensure of air ambulance services and special personnel equipment operation and activities; identifies such standards as including response and operations standards, standards for communications, and records and forms. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 68, Chapter 140.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2862 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee