TN HB2667 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the commissioner of health and the commissioner of mental health and substance abuse services to allow certain rules to not be applied to certain healthcare professionals and students in order for those persons to operate outside of normal licensure requirements during a healthcare staffing crisis; requires certain notice to governor and speakers of the senate and house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to the availability of healthcare personnel in healthcare facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Effective date(s) 04/29/2022 | |
2022-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 954 | |
2022-04-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-14 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 90, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB2667 |
2022-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/14/22 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0756) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0654) |
2022-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2550 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 954