TN HB2665 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 749
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 749
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prescribes procedure for paper ballots in counties using optical scan voting systems and procedure for provisional ballots. - Amends TCA Section 2-7-114(c).
Title
As enacted, prescribes procedure for paper ballots in counties using optical scan voting systems and procedure for provisional ballots. - Amends TCA Section 2-7-114(c).
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 749 | |
2018-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2638 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 749