TN HB2661 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits members of any state commission that has not formed audit committee from receiving compensation until such committee is formed or exception to forming the committee is granted by comptroller. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 35, Part 1 and Title 57, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, prohibits members of any state commission that has not formed audit committee from receiving compensation until such committee is formed or exception to forming the committee is granted by comptroller. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 35, Part 1 and Title 57, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2572 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2661&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2661.pdf |