TN HB2646 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1063
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1063
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes, in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, transfers from the department of safety, handgun permit reserve. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 29; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 62; Title 63; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, authorizes, in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, transfers from the department of safety, handgun permit reserve. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 29; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 62; Title 63; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1063 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-30 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 1 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1006) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1122) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1222) |
2018-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Appropriations Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/16/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2553 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1063