TN HB2645 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts provisions governing decentralized organizations - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 7; Title 12; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 7; Title 12; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 66 and Title 67, relative to blockchains.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective date(s) 04/20/2022 | |
2022-04-25 | Pub. Ch. 852 | |
2022-04-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 0 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0687) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0748) |
2022-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-28 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2854 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 852