TN HB2645 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 838
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 838
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the drugs whose production, manufacture, distribution, sale or possession would be a crime under the present law offense regarding synthetic derivatives or analogues of methcathinone. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, expands the drugs whose production, manufacture, distribution, sale or possession would be a crime under the present law offense regarding synthetic derivatives or analogues of methcathinone. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH & HUMAN RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HHR SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health & Human Resources Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH & HUMAN RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HHR SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health & Human Resources Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 838 | |
2012-05-03 | Effective date(s) 07/01/12 | |
2012-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-04-18 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-04-18 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-16 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-04-12 | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-12 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-04-11 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-04-09 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-04-09 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-09 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA1039) | |
2012-04-09 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0814) | |
2012-04-09 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0813) | |
2012-04-05 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-03-23 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Assigned to s/c Judiciary Subcommittee | |
2012-03-07 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2012-02-28 | Action Def. in s/c HHR Subcommittee to 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on s/c cal HHR Subcommittee for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | Assigned to s/c HHR Subcommittee | |
2012-01-19 | P2C, ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee--Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2507 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 838