TN HB2637 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes reimbursement rate for counties holding state inmates as adjusted based upon the percentage of change in the average consumer price index as published by the United States Department of Labor. - Amends TCA Section 41-8-106.
Title
As introduced, establishes reimbursement rate for counties holding state inmates as adjusted based upon the percentage of change in the average consumer price index as published by the United States Department of Labor. - Amends TCA Section 41-8-106.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-04-10 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/10/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to 3/14/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee | |
2012-01-19 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2533 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.