TN HB2624 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 966
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 966
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the Tennessee Civil Rights Crimes Information, Reconciliation, and Research Center. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4 and Title 62.
Title
As enacted, creates the Tennessee Civil Rights Crimes Information, Reconciliation, and Research Center. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4 and Title 62.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnnie Turner [D] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 966 | |
2018-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/15/2018 | |
2018-05-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-24 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 94, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB2624 |
2018-04-23 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA1085) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 7 |
2018-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1117) |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2631 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 966