TN HB2621 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the term "crime of violence" in regard to weapons offenses includes aggravated rape of a child rather than especially aggravated rape of a child. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 16; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that the term "crime of violence" in regard to weapons offenses includes aggravated rape of a child rather than especially aggravated rape of a child. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 16; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 71, Nays 1, PNV 18 |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-19 | House | Ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2276 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee