TN HB2589 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 792
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing probation periods for state employment. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 30.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises provisions governing probation periods for state employment. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 30.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 792
2018-04-05HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-04-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018
2018-03-28HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018
2018-03-20HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/20/2018
2018-03-14HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-28HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
2018-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2018-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2018-02-05HouseP1C.
2018-02-01HouseFiled for intro.
2018-02-01HouseIntro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2443 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 792

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback