TN HB2566 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes up to two owners of an LLC that owns property in a city to vote in the city's elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, authorizes up to two owners of an LLC that owns property in a city to vote in the city's elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2393 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee