TN HB2562 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/25/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/25/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Safe Access to Medical Cannabis Act." - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Safe Access to Medical Cannabis Act." - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/25/2010 | |
2010-05-19 | Action def. in Calendar & Rules to Next Calendar | |
2010-05-19 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-05-12 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/18/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/12/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-04-27 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/27/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/20/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee for review--Health & Human Resources | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-13 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2511 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2562&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2562.pdf |