TN HB2555 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the behavioral health crisis intervention services board to provide oversight and input on the development of an integrated behavioral health crisis care system in this state; imposes a behavioral health crisis intervention services surcharge on certain telephone services; creates the behavioral health crisis intervention services fund to receive the surcharge funds. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to 988 Suicide & Crisis Lifeline.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee- Government Operations for Review |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1789 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee